|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6294.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 4693.).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 7).
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 1036.)
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|