LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB472
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB472
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB472
Compare Versions
AB472 Chaptered September 17, 2012
AB472 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB472 Amended March 8, 2012
AB472 Amended September 2, 2011
AB472 Amended June 13, 2011
AB472 Amended May 23, 2011
AB472 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB472 Chaptered September 17, 2012
AB472 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB472 Amended March 8, 2012
AB472 Amended September 2, 2011
AB472 Amended June 13, 2011
AB472 Amended May 23, 2011
AB472 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare