|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 274, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 9. Page 2492.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1962.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 7. Page 1457.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|