California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2011

Amended

Bill June 21, 2011
Bill June 7, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 24, 2011