|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6362.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4744.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1351.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|