LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB480
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB480
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB480
Compare Versions
AB480 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB480 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB480 Amended August 21, 2012
AB480 Amended May 29, 2012
AB480 Amended April 30, 2012
AB480 Amended June 23, 2011
AB480 Amended June 10, 2011
AB480 Amended June 2, 2011
AB480 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB480 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB480 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB480 Amended August 21, 2012
AB480 Amended May 29, 2012
AB480 Amended April 30, 2012
AB480 Amended June 23, 2011
AB480 Amended June 10, 2011
AB480 Amended June 2, 2011
AB480 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare