|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2500.).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1687.).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1491.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|