California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB483 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2011

Amended

Bill June 23, 2011
Bill June 15, 2011