|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 5071.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 4945.) From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(15) suspended. (Page 4911.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4911.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator La Malfa.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1636.)
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|