California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 30, 2012
Bill August 29, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill July 6, 2012
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 15, 2011
Bill April 5, 2011