06/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/02/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/02/2011 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1825.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 26. Page 1827.) | |||
06/01/2011 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 34. Page 1754.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/28/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Read first time. To print. |