BILL NUMBER: AB 505AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Harkey FEBRUARY 15, 2011 An act to add Section 56410 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 505, as amended, Harkey. Housing programs: audits. Existing law establishes the Department of Housing and Community Development which, among other things, administers various programs providing assistance for multifamily housing, emergency housing, farmworker housing, and home ownership and downpayment assistance. This bill would require the Bureau of State Audits, on or before January 1, 2013, and every24 years thereafter, to conduct a performance audit of all programs funded through special or General Fund sources and administered by the department. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 56410 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 56410. On or before January 1, 2013, and everytwofour years thereafter, the Bureau of State Audits shall conduct a performance audit of all programs funded through special or General Fund sources and administered by the department.