California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB511 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2012

Amended

Bill June 4, 2012
Bill April 13, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011