LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB511
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB511
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB511
Compare Versions
AB511 Chaptered August 27, 2012
AB511 Enrolled August 13, 2012
AB511 Amended June 4, 2012
AB511 Amended April 13, 2011
AB511 Amended March 31, 2011
AB511 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB511 Chaptered August 27, 2012
AB511 Enrolled August 13, 2012
AB511 Amended June 4, 2012
AB511 Amended April 13, 2011
AB511 Amended March 31, 2011
AB511 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare