California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB512 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2011

Amended

Bill August 25, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011