LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB512
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB512
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB512
Compare Versions
AB512 Chaptered October 6, 2011
AB512 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB512 Amended August 25, 2011
AB512 Amended July 12, 2011
AB512 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB512 Chaptered October 6, 2011
AB512 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB512 Amended August 25, 2011
AB512 Amended July 12, 2011
AB512 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare