|
08/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 183, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5836.).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4317.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 3627.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|