California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2012

Amended

Bill June 6, 2012
Bill January 24, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill March 31, 2011