|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3131.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2388.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (September 7). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1667.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|