California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB525 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011