|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 217, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1966.).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 11).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1733.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|