California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 11, 2011