California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB56 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill September 7, 2011
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill July 13, 2011
Bill June 29, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 18, 2011
Bill March 16, 2011
Bill February 23, 2011