LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB56
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB56
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB56
Compare Versions
AB56 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB56 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB56 Amended September 7, 2011
AB56 Amended September 2, 2011
AB56 Amended August 30, 2011
AB56 Amended July 13, 2011
AB56 Amended June 29, 2011
AB56 Amended May 27, 2011
AB56 Amended May 18, 2011
AB56 Amended March 16, 2011
AB56 Amended February 23, 2011
AB56 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB56 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB56 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB56 Amended September 7, 2011
AB56 Amended September 2, 2011
AB56 Amended August 30, 2011
AB56 Amended July 13, 2011
AB56 Amended June 29, 2011
AB56 Amended May 27, 2011
AB56 Amended May 18, 2011
AB56 Amended March 16, 2011
AB56 Amended February 23, 2011
AB56 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare