|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 479, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 19. Page 3075.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2364.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 1670.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|