California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB565 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/06/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 565CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 479 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 6, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 5, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 30, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Monning (Coauthor: Senator Blakeslee) FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to add Section 31111.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to conservation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 565, Monning. Conservation: State Coastal Conservancy. Existing law establishes the State Coastal Conservancy in the Natural Resources Agency with prescribed powers and responsibilities for implementing a program of agricultural land protection, area restoration, and resource enhancement within the coastal zone, as defined. Existing law authorizes the conservancy, for the purpose of implementing the provisions governing the conservancy, to fund and undertake plans and feasibility studies, and award grants to public agencies and nonprofit organizations. This bill would additionally authorize the conservancy, for the purpose of implementing the provisions governing the conservancy, to award a grant to a for-profit entity to accomplish removal or alteration of the San Clemente Dam under specified conditions. The bill would limit total expenditures of state funds for the removal or alteration of the San Clemente Dam and related activities to not more than $25,000,000. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 31111.5 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 31111.5. (a) In implementing this division, the conservancy may award a grant to a for-profit entity to accomplish removal or alteration of the San Clemente Dam if the conservancy finds that the project is of regional or statewide significance and that a grant to a public agency or nonprofit organization would not achieve removal or alteration of the San Clemente Dam. (b) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), total expenditures of state funds for the removal or alteration of the San Clemente Dam and related activities shall not exceed twenty-five million dollars ($25,000,000).