|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4219.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 1783.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|