LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB580
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB580
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB580
Compare Versions
AB580 Amended June 28, 2012
AB580 Amended June 26, 2012
AB580 Amended June 12, 2012
AB580 Amended August 15, 2011
AB580 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB580 Amended June 28, 2012
AB580 Amended June 26, 2012
AB580 Amended June 12, 2012
AB580 Amended August 15, 2011
AB580 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare