California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB592 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 31, 2011
Bill July 1, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011