LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB592
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB592
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB592
Compare Versions
AB592 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB592 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB592 Amended August 31, 2011
AB592 Amended July 1, 2011
AB592 Amended April 25, 2011
AB592 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB592 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB592 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB592 Amended August 31, 2011
AB592 Amended July 1, 2011
AB592 Amended April 25, 2011
AB592 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare