|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 803, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 6235.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4646.).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 3622.)
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|