California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB593 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill May 21, 2012
Bill January 5, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill March 31, 2011