California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill June 15, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011
Bill March 22, 2011