LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB620
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB620
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB620
Compare Versions
AB620 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB620 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB620 Amended August 30, 2011
AB620 Amended August 15, 2011
AB620 Amended June 15, 2011
AB620 Amended May 27, 2011
AB620 Amended March 31, 2011
AB620 Amended March 22, 2011
AB620 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB620 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB620 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB620 Amended August 30, 2011
AB620 Amended August 15, 2011
AB620 Amended June 15, 2011
AB620 Amended May 27, 2011
AB620 Amended March 31, 2011
AB620 Amended March 22, 2011
AB620 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare