|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2556.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2009.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1127.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|