LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB623
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB623
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB623
Compare Versions
AB623 Chaptered September 21, 2011
AB623 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB623 Amended August 15, 2011
AB623 Amended April 6, 2011
AB623 Amended March 24, 2011
AB623 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB623 Chaptered September 21, 2011
AB623 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB623 Amended August 15, 2011
AB623 Amended April 6, 2011
AB623 Amended March 24, 2011
AB623 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare