|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 407, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3133.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2383.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 983.)
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|