California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011