|
09/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2349.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 906.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 15).
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 9.
|
|
|
|
12/09/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|