LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB65
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB65
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB65
Compare Versions
AB65 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB65 Amended August 31, 2011
AB65 Amended August 24, 2011
AB65 Amended July 13, 2011
AB65 Amended June 27, 2011
AB65 Amended March 22, 2011
AB65 Amended February 2, 2011
AB65 Introduced December 9, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB65 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB65 Amended August 31, 2011
AB65 Amended August 24, 2011
AB65 Amended July 13, 2011
AB65 Amended June 27, 2011
AB65 Amended March 22, 2011
AB65 Amended February 2, 2011
AB65 Introduced December 9, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare