|
10/07/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2912.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 2205.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 1043.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|