LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB651
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB651
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB651
Compare Versions
AB651 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB651 Amended August 29, 2011
AB651 Amended July 11, 2011
AB651 Amended June 1, 2011
AB651 Amended April 5, 2011
AB651 Amended March 22, 2011
AB651 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB651 Enrolled September 12, 2011
AB651 Amended August 29, 2011
AB651 Amended July 11, 2011
AB651 Amended June 1, 2011
AB651 Amended April 5, 2011
AB651 Amended March 22, 2011
AB651 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare