|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 278, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2494.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1962.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1508.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|