California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB654 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2011

Amended

Bill June 28, 2011
Bill June 13, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011