|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2714.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1857.).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1351.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|