California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB655 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2011

Amended

Bill July 6, 2011
Bill June 1, 2011
Bill May 5, 2011