|
10/03/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2970.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2167.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1756.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|