LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB656
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB656
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB656
Compare Versions
AB656 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB656 Amended August 25, 2011
AB656 Amended August 16, 2011
AB656 Amended July 1, 2011
AB656 Amended June 23, 2011
AB656 Amended May 10, 2011
AB656 Amended March 31, 2011
AB656 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB656 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB656 Amended August 25, 2011
AB656 Amended August 16, 2011
AB656 Amended July 1, 2011
AB656 Amended June 23, 2011
AB656 Amended May 10, 2011
AB656 Amended March 31, 2011
AB656 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare