|
10/03/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2967.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2167.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1509.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|