LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB680
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB680
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB680
Compare Versions
AB680 Chaptered October 3, 2011
AB680 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB680 Amended August 25, 2011
AB680 Amended July 6, 2011
AB680 Amended June 22, 2011
AB680 Amended May 5, 2011
AB680 Amended March 29, 2011
AB680 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB680 Chaptered October 3, 2011
AB680 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB680 Amended August 25, 2011
AB680 Amended July 6, 2011
AB680 Amended June 22, 2011
AB680 Amended May 5, 2011
AB680 Amended March 29, 2011
AB680 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare